Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renters' Property Tax Relief and Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Programs - Gross Income and Assessed Value Limitations - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "gross income" to exclude public assistance received in a cash grant for purposes of the renters' property tax relief program and the homeowners' property tax credit program; increasing the combined gross income limit used to determine eligibility for the tax credits; and increasing, from $300,000 to $450,000, the maximum assessed value of a dwelling on which the homeowners' property tax credit is calculated.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0343
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/25/2023
Legislative Date
10/25/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/25/2023 10/25/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Renters' Property Tax Relief and Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Programs - Gross Income and Assessed Value Limitations - Alterations
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:44 PM
Click to return on the top page