Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks, Kaiser, Kelly, Afzali, Ali, D. Barnes, Buckel, Ebersole, Hornberger, C. Howard, Long, Luedtke, Mosby, Patterson, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, Tarlau, Turner, Walker, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Including income from an individual retirement account or a certain annuity within a certain subtraction modification for certain retirement income under certain circumstances; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/15/2017
Legislative Date
11/15/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2018
Legislative Date
1/11/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {105969/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/15/2017 11/15/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
House 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/11/2018 1/11/2018 Hearing canceled
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {105969/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page