Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ethics – Local Governments – Registration of Lobbyists
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing requirements for model lobbying registration requirements that are adopted by the State Ethics Commission for local governments; and requiring lobbying provisions adopted by local governments to be similar to a certain law, rather than substantially similar.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/09/2021
Legislative Date
7/09/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Ethics – Local Governments – Registration of Lobbyists
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/09/2021 7/09/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Ethics – Local Governments – Registration of Lobbyists
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/23/2022 5:05 PM
Click to return on the top page