Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to be the Maryland Department of Labor; renaming the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to be the Secretary of Labor; providing that the Maryland Department of Labor is the successor of the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; providing that certain names and titles of a certain unit and officials in laws and other documents mean the names and titles of the successor unit and officials; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 02/21 (Delegate D. E. Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 Hearing canceled
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Motion Special Order until 02/21 (Delegate D. E. Davis) Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Favorable Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Second Reading Passed 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Referred Finance 35AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Text - Chapter - Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming
(   1-101, 2-101, 2-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page