Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Formerly Incarcerated Individuals and Individuals on Probation - Re-Entry Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Taveras and Taylor
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a program within the Division of Correction that provides formerly incarcerated individuals and individuals on probation with certain services; requiring the facility that administers the program to be located in Prince George's County; and requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill for fiscal year 2026 and each fiscal year thereafter an appropriation of $3,000,000 for the program.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0720
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/18/2023
Legislative Date
10/18/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/18/2023 10/18/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services - Formerly Incarcerated Individuals and Individuals on Probation - Re-Entry Services
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:45 PM
Click to return on the top page