Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Loan Servicers, and Loan Originators
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain net worth requirements for certain applicants and licensees for certain mortgage lending, loan servicing, and loan origination activities; establishing certain net worth requirements for certain applicants and licensees acting as mortgage loan servicers for government-sponsored enterprises and other entities; authorizing the use of an irrevocable letter of credit from certain institutions to satisfy certain requirements under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {483296/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Loan Servicers, and Loan Originators
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 Hearing canceled
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {483296/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Loan Servicers, and Loan Originators
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Finance 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Text - Chapter - Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Loan Servicers, and Loan Originators
(   1-101, 11-508.1, 11-512, 11-513, 11-513.1, 11-515, 11-609 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page