Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Cost Estimate Notice - Required
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring health care practitioners to provide specified information relating to the cost of a health care service to an individual or the parent or guardian of a minor; requiring the information to be provided in writing before performing the health care service; and excluding emergency health care services from the application of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/20/2016
Legislative Date
10/20/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Care Practitioners - Cost Estimate Notice - Required
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/20/2016 10/20/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Care Practitioners - Cost Estimate Notice - Required
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page