Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Bus Stops
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that if any early voting center is located within one-half mile of a fixed local bus route and to the maximum extent practicable, buses operating on that route allow passengers to embark and disembark at the entrance of the early voting center during the times the center is open for voting.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0656 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/10/2021
Legislative Date
9/10/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Bus Stops
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2022
Legislative Date
1/04/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/10/2021 9/10/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Bus Stops
House 1/04/2022 1/04/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 1/12/2022 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page