Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credits - Public School Employees, Health and Safety Improvements, and Property Used for Local Housing Programs
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit for certain residential real property owned by a public school employee under certain circumstances; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit for certain buildings if the owner made certain health or safety improvements on or after July 1, 2024; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/02/2023
Legislative Date
10/02/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-34)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-7)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/30/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/02/2023 10/02/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax Credits - Public School Employees, Health and Safety Improvements, and Property Used for Local Housing Programs
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax Credits - Public School Employees, Health and Safety Improvements, and Property Used for Local Housing Programs
House 3/01/2024 2/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (99-34) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2024 2/21/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Favorable 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator King) Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Favorable Adopted 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Second Reading Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (32-7) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/30/2024 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
(   9-268 through 9-270 )
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 11:55 PM
Click to return on the top page