Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Real Property Assessments and Appeals
Sponsored by
Delegate Amprey
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to publish on its website certain information in plain language relating to the assessment process and methodology used by the Department in determining the value of real property; and allowing certain authorities to consider certain criteria when hearing an appeal that relates to the valuation of real property.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0247
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1290 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/20/2021
Legislative Date
10/20/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2022
Legislative Date
1/04/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/20/2021 10/20/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Real Property Assessments and Appeals
House 1/04/2022 1/04/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/18/2022 10:06 AM
Click to return on the top page