Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Brewery License Holders - Food Service
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Kaiser, and Queen
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the restriction on a holder of a Class 8 farm brewery license selling or serving only specified types of food; allowing the holder to sell and serve any food if the holder is licensed to operate a food establishment, subject to specified requirements; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0210
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2017
Legislative Date
1/12/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {713498/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2017 1/12/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Brewery License Holders - Food Service
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {713498/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Brewery License Holders - Food Service
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Referred Rules 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page