Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Graduation Requirements - Fine Arts
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that a requirement to earn a credit in fine arts in order to graduate from a public high school may be satisfied by completing a course in computer science, multimedia, or computer programming.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2017
Legislative Date
1/12/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Graduation Requirements - Fine Arts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2017 1/12/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Graduation Requirements - Fine Arts
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
(   7-205.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page