Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Water Pollution Control – Intervention in Civil Actions – Rights and Authority
Sponsored by
Delegate Love
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a person who meets the threshold standing requirements under the federal Clean Water Act has an unconditional right and authority to intervene in a civil action that the State initiates in State court to require compliance with certain water pollution control measures; requiring a person exercising a certain right of intervention to intervene in accordance with the applicable practices, procedures, and laws of the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0334
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {400515/1 Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-40)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Water Pollution Control – Intervention in Civil Actions – Rights and Authority
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {400515/1 Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Water Pollution Control – Intervention in Civil Actions – Rights and Authority
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (92-40) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (44-3) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Returned Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Text - Chapter - Water Pollution Control – Intervention in Civil Actions – Rights and Authority
(   9-344.1 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:17 PM
Click to return on the top page