Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Energy and Property Taxes
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting certain community solar energy generating systems from local energy taxes and personal property taxes.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0264
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022, July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2022
Legislative Date
1/04/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Energy and Property Taxes
House 1/04/2022 1/04/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/18/2022 4:00 PM
Click to return on the top page