Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Personal Injury and Wrongful Death
Sponsored by
Delegates Ziegler, Boyce, Charkoudian, Foley, Kaufman, Ruff, Ruth, Terrasa, and Wu
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain limitations on noneconomic damages in civil actions for personal injury or wrongful death; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0538
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0862 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/22/2023
Legislative Date
9/22/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2024
Legislative Date
1/23/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/22/2023 9/22/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Personal Injury and Wrongful Death
House 1/23/2024 1/23/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:46 PM
Click to return on the top page