Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting returned Peace Corps volunteers who are domiciled in the State from paying nonresident tuition at a public institution of higher education in the State; establishing that returned Peace Corps volunteer students shall be included as in-State residents for the computation of State aid to community colleges; and requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to adopt regulations.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0050
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/27/2021
Legislative Date
9/27/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/27/2021 9/27/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
(   15-106.11 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 10:38 AM
Click to return on the top page