Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Prohibition Against Penalization for Seeking Mental Health Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks, Bagnall, Cox, C. Jackson, and R. Lewis
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a law enforcement agency from retaliating against, penalizing, or punishing a police officer because the police officer has sought or received mental health services.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0074
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/16/2020
Legislative Date
10/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Police Officers – Mental Health – Employee Assistance Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {862918/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/16/2020 10/16/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Police Officers – Mental Health – Employee Assistance Programs
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments {862918/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Prohibition Against Penalization for Seeking Mental Health Services
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Referred Rules 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:04 AM
Click to return on the top page