Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Access to Public Records - Handgun Permit Records
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Kelly and Kipke
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a custodian to deny inspection of a record of a specified handgun permit and a specified handgun permit application; and requiring a custodian to permit inspection of specified records by the handgun permit holder or handgun permit applicant.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0688
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/11/2013 1/14/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page