Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of Authority
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Transferring the authority for the administration of the Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account from the Board of Public Works to the Department of Commerce; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0498
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {469333/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of Authority
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of Authority
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {469333/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
(   9-1A-27, 9-1A-35 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page