Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Commerce, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0089
Title
Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0092 (SB0498/CH0453)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0094 /CH0258
Title
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Requirements for Matching Funds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161
Title
Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Restructuring
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0245 /CH0259
Title
Department of Commerce - Maryland Advisory Commission on Manufacturing Competitiveness - Renaming and Restructuring
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0872
Title
Tax Credits - Enterprise Zones, RISE Zones, and Maryland Jobs Development Projects
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 /CH0453 (HB0092)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0089 Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
HB0092 (SB0498/CH0453) Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0094 /CH0258 Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Requirements for Matching Funds By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Ways and Means
2/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0161 Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Restructuring By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0245 /CH0259 Department of Commerce - Maryland Advisory Commission on Manufacturing Competitiveness - Renaming and Restructuring By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Economic Matters
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0872 Tax Credits - Enterprise Zones, RISE Zones, and Maryland Jobs Development Projects By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0498 /CH0453 (HB0092) Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page