Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act – Assistance With Governmental Benefits and Programs
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering statutory forms for a limited and general power of attorney to include certain provisions relating to the authority of an agent to perform certain acts to assist the principal in meeting eligibility requirements and qualifying for certain governmental benefits or programs; and altering a certain provision in a certain statutory form for a limited power of attorney relating to the authority of an agent to make a gift of part or all of a principal's property or to take certain action with respect to certain trusts.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0870 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/18/2021
Legislative Date
8/18/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/18/2021 8/18/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act – Assistance With Governmental Benefits and Programs
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/13/2022 4:41 PM
Click to return on the top page