Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Comptroller)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting specified feminine hygiene products from the sales and use tax.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Referred Rules 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
(   11-211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page