Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Meeting Requirements and Officers
Sponsored by
Delegate Bagnall
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirements for meetings of the Anne Arundel County Board of Education regarding the conduct of public business; prohibiting the Board from voting on any action after 10:00 P.M.; and requiring the county board to elect a parliamentarian.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Meeting Requirements and Officers
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/24/2022 9:50 AM
Click to return on the top page