Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Inheritance Tax Rate – Beneficiaries of Limited Means
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, under certain circumstances, the inheritance tax due on certain real property that passes from a decedent to or for the use of certain beneficiaries of limited means.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/11/2022
Legislative Date
11/11/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Inheritance Tax Rate – Beneficiaries of Limited Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/11/2022 11/11/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Inheritance Tax Rate – Beneficiaries of Limited Means
House 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/31/2023 4:39 PM
Click to return on the top page