Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health – System for Newborn Screening – Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Shetty
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 2:50 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the newborn screening program in the Maryland Department of Health to require testing for each condition listed by the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services' Recommended Uniform Screening Program.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0242
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/07/2021
Legislative Date
10/07/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:50 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/07/2021 10/07/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health – System for Newborn Screening – Requirements
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 2:50 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 2:47 PM
Click to return on the top page