Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program, Maryland Children's Health Program, and Workgroup on Low-Income Utility Assistance
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Pena-Melnyk, Cullison, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Guzzone, Hill, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, Rosenberg, Taveras, White, and Woods
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish an Express Lane Eligibility Program by January 1, 2025, to enroll individuals, based on certain eligibility, in the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and the Maryland Children's Health Program; and requiring the Workgroup on Low-Income Utility Assistance to submit a final report to certain committees of the General Assembly by January 1, 2024, of its findings and recommendations, including recommended legislative and regulatory changes.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0026
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/26/2022
Legislative Date
9/26/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2023
Legislative Date
1/22/2023
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {143829/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-36)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/07/2023
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2023
Legislative Date
4/03/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2023
Legislative Date
3/21/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {613127/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2023
Legislative Date
3/21/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2023
Legislative Date
3/22/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/28/2023
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/28/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-36)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/28/2023
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/03/2023
Legislative Date
5/03/2023
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/26/2022 9/26/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program, Maryland Children's Health Program, and Social Services Programs - Eligibility and Enrollment
House 1/22/2023 1/22/2023 Hearing 2/07 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2023 3/13/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Favorable with Amendments {143829/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Maryland Children's Health Program - Eligibility and Enrollment
House 3/15/2023 3/06/2023 Third Reading Passed (99-36) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/07/2023 Referred Finance 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2023 4/03/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2023 3/21/2023 Favorable with Amendments {613127/1 Adopted 58AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2023 3/21/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2023 3/22/2023 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2023 3/28/2023 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2023 3/28/2023 Third Reading Passed (101-36) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2023 3/28/2023 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Medical Assistance Program, Maryland Children's Health Program, and Workgroup on Low-Income Utility Assistance
Post Passage 5/03/2023 5/03/2023 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program, Maryland Children's Health Program, and Workgroup on Low-Income Utility Assistance
Last Updated: 6/9/2023 2:22 PM
Click to return on the top page