Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ballot Access - Affiliating With a Party - Unaffiliated Voters
Sponsored by
Delegate Qi
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a local board of elections to change a voter's registration from a decline to affiliate with a political party when voter registration is closed if the request to affiliate is received by the local board by 5 p.m. on the day before early voting begins; and providing that the change is effective for the next election.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0039
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/30/2022
Legislative Date
9/30/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Ballot Access - Affiliating With a Party - Unaffiliated Voters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2023
Legislative Date
1/12/2023
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/30/2022 9/30/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Ballot Access - Affiliating With a Party - Unaffiliated Voters
House 1/12/2023 1/12/2023 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/25/2023 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page