Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Bagnall, Feldmark, Healey, Kerr, R. Lewis, Smith, Solomon, Stein, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include certain appropriations in the State budget from the Transportation Trust Fund to the Maryland Transit Administration for certain operating and capital needs in certain fiscal years; authorizing the reduction of certain appropriations under certain circumstances; requiring that certain capital appropriations be in addition to capital funds appropriated for the Purple Line; requiring the Administration to submit a certain report annually; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0199
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/09/2020
Legislative Date
9/09/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
House 9/09/2020 9/09/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/21/2021 1:44 PM
Click to return on the top page