Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Arbitration Reform for State Employees Act of 2024
Sponsored by
Delegates J. Lewis, Harris, and Solomon
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the collective bargaining process for State employees, including by requiring the selection of a neutral arbitrator to oversee all aspects of collective bargaining, establishing a process of arbitration in the event of impasse, and providing that certain decisions of a neutral arbitrator are advisory; requiring that each budget bill contain the appropriations necessary to implement all terms and conditions of employment in certain memoranda of understanding for the next ensuing fiscal year; etc.
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0188
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0380 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/14/2023
Legislative Date
8/14/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2024
Legislative Date
1/05/2024
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Arbitration Reform for State Employees Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2024
Legislative Date
1/11/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2024
Legislative Date
1/11/2024
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/14/2023 8/14/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/05/2024 1/05/2024 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Arbitration Reform for State Employees Act of 2024
House 1/11/2024 1/11/2024 Hearing canceled
House 1/11/2024 1/11/2024 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 Hearing canceled
House 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:47 PM
Click to return on the top page