Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Transfer to Heir - Exemption From Prepayment
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that certain requirements for the prepayment of certain real property taxes do not apply to an instrument of writing transferring real property from the estate of a decedent to an heir of the decedent.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1015 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/27/2021
Legislative Date
9/27/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Transfer to Heir - Exemption From Prepayment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2022
Legislative Date
1/04/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/27/2021 9/27/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Real Property - Transfer to Heir - Exemption From Prepayment
House 1/04/2022 1/04/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/17/2022 1:41 PM
Click to return on the top page