Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification for Veterans
Sponsored by
Delegate Brooks
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a $3,000 subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain veterans who are discharged or released under honorable circumstances from active military, naval, or air service of the United States.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0537 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/18/2021
Legislative Date
10/18/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification for Veterans
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2022
Legislative Date
1/04/2022
Action
Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/18/2021 10/18/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification for Veterans
House 1/04/2022 1/04/2022 Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/17/2022 4:38 PM
Click to return on the top page