Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions – Standard Time – Year–Round Daylight Saving Time
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the standard time in the State to be Eastern Daylight Time year-round.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1013 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Contingency - on federal, state, or local action
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/10/2021
Legislative Date
9/10/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/10/2021 9/10/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - General Provisions – Standard Time – Year–Round Daylight Saving Time
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 12:33 PM
Click to return on the top page