Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - State Song - Advisory Panel
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Crutchfield, Ebersole, Haynes, R. Lewis, Lierman, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, and Wells
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the State song; establishing the State Song Advisory Panel; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Advisory Panel; requiring the Advisory Panel to review certain submissions and suggestions for a new State song and to hold at least three public hearings; requiring the Advisory Panel to report its recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2019; terminating a certain provision of the Act after June 30, 2020; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0508 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019, June 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Provisions - State Song - Advisory Panel
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - General Provisions - State Song - Advisory Panel
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page