Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill – Chain of Custody
Sponsored by
Delegate Lehman
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a producer of synthetic turf and turf infill sold or distributed in the State to establish a system to track the chain of custody of the synthetic turf and turf infill and report the chain of custody to the Department of the Environment; requiring a certain owner of synthetic turf and turf infill to report certain information to the Department; requiring the Department to develop and maintain a website that displays certain chain of custody information; and making a violation of the Act a civil offense.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0321
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0857 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/13/2021
Legislative Date
7/13/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment – Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill – Chain of Custody
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/13/2021 7/13/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment – Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill – Chain of Custody
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
(   9-2401 through 9-2404 )
Last Updated: 1/20/2022 5:44 AM
Click to return on the top page