Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)
Sponsored by
Delegate Bagnall
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the minimum age, from 16 years to 12 years, at which a minor has the same capacity as an adult to consent to consultation, diagnosis, and certain treatment of a mental or emotional disorder by a health care provider or clinic; and providing that a health care provider may decide to provide certain information to a certain parent, guardian, or custodian under certain provisions of law unless the health care provider believes the disclosure will lead to harm to the minor or deter the minor from seeking care.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0041
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {413628/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (44-87)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {953029/1 (Delegate Rose)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {953029/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (49-87)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {413522/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (48-86)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {223129/1 (Delegate McComas) Rejected (45-90)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {153628/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (42-93)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-44)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Floor Amendment {413628/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (44-87) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Floor Amendment {953029/1 (Delegate Rose) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Floor Amendment {953029/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (49-87) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Floor Amendment {413522/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (48-86) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Floor Amendment {223129/1 (Delegate McComas) Rejected (45-90) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Floor Amendment {153628/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (42-93) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted 41AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Second Reading Passed 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (92-44) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Referred Rules 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 7:02 PM
Click to return on the top page