Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Sealant Products - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Amprey, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Jalisi, Lehman, Lierman, Love, Ruth, Stein, and Terrasa
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after October 1, 2023, a person from supplying, selling, or offering for sale a high-PAH sealant product for application to a driveway or parking area in the State; prohibiting, on or after October 1, 2023, a person from applying or soliciting the application of a high-PAH sealant product to a driveway or parking area in the State; establishing a civil penalty up to $2,500 for each violation and an administrative penalty up to $2,500 for each violation, but not exceeding $100,000 total; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0372
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/20/2021
Legislative Date
9/20/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {173124/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-41)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {823027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-41)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/20/2021 9/20/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Environment – Coal Tar Sealant Products – Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2022)
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {173124/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - Sealant Products - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2022)
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (93-41) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments {823027/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (91-41) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Environment - Sealant Products - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2022)
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Text - Chapter - Environment - Sealant Products - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2022)
(   9-2401 through 9-2405, 9-320   )
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:24 PM
Click to return on the top page