Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (Christopher King Access to Treatment Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate K. Young
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets certain requirements to administer maintenance injectable medications to a patient under certain circumstances; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, by September 1, 2021, and in consultation with the State Board of Physicians and the State Board of Nursing to adopt certain regulations establishing standard procedures to include notification of patients about payment for services before the pharmacist administers a maintenance injectable medication; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0084
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/14/2020
Legislative Date
9/14/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {826889/1 Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-6)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744436/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {253022/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Kelly, Cullison and Kipke)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Kelly, Cullison and Kipke)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Motion Reconsider Amendments (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Motion Withdraw Amendments (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/14/2020 9/14/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Pharmacists - Administration of Self-Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments {826889/1 Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pharmacists - Administration of Self-Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (121-6) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments {744436/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Floor Amendment {253022/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 House Requests Senate Recede 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Kelly, Cullison and Kipke) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 House Requests Senate Recede 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Kelly, Cullison and Kipke) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Motion Reconsider Amendments (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Motion Withdraw Amendments (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Senate Recede 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Senate Recede 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Returned Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
(   15-716 )
Last Updated: 4/15/2021 10:41 AM
Click to return on the top page