Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Single–Use Plastics – Restrictions
Sponsored by
Delegate Love
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting, beginning January 1, 2023, a food service business from providing certain single-use food or beverage products to a customer ordering carryout or delivery from or dining inside the food service business unless the customer requests or accepts an offer for the single-use products; requiring a food service business to maintain a limited stock of single-use plastic straws for certain customers; and authorizing a food service business to submit a request to a governmental entity for a waiver of up to 3 months.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/04/2021
Legislative Date
10/04/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment – Single–Use Plastics – Restrictions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/04/2021 10/04/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Environment – Single–Use Plastics – Restrictions
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
(   9-2101,   9-2105,   9-2108 through 9-2110 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 10:53 AM
Click to return on the top page