Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Human Services - Electric Universal Service Program - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Services to authorize benefits under the electric universal service program for an electric customer who does not meet the eligibility requirements for the federal Low Income Home Energy Assistance Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0283
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/26/2021
Legislative Date
10/26/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/26/2021 10/26/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Department of Human Services - Electric Universal Service Program - Eligibility
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 9:57 AM
Click to return on the top page