Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Limitation and Methods
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr and Charkoudian
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the percentage of the weekly benefits amount that the Secretary of Labor may deduct from weekly benefits payable to a claimant to recover certain overpayments of unemployment insurance benefits to 50% of the weekly benefit or 25% if the benefit is less than $100; and clarifying the circumstances under which the Secretary may use certain methods to recover overpayments of unemployment insurance benefits.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0136
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2023
Legislative Date
1/13/2023
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Limitation and Methods
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2023
Legislative Date
2/01/2023
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2023
Legislative Date
2/28/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2023
Legislative Date
2/26/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2023
Legislative Date
2/26/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Limitation and Methods
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/28/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-6)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/28/2023
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
37AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2023 1/13/2023 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Limitation and Methods
House 2/01/2023 2/01/2023 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2023 2/28/2023 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/01/2023 2/26/2023 Favorable Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2023 2/26/2023 Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Limitation and Methods
House 3/03/2023 2/28/2023 Third Reading Passed (125-6) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2023 2/28/2023 Referred Finance 37AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/9/2023 4:24 PM
Click to return on the top page