Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing to two the number of meetings the board of directors or the developer of a condominium or a homeowners association must convene each year at which unit owners have an opportunity to comment; requiring the developer of a condominium to appoint a unit owner, not otherwise affiliated with the developer, to the board within 30 days after the date on which units representing 25% of the votes have been conveyed by the developer to members of the public for residential purposes; requiring the maintenance of certain books and records; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0352 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/29/2021
Legislative Date
9/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/06/2022
Legislative Date
1/06/2022
Action
Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/29/2021 9/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
House 1/06/2022 1/06/2022 Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/17/2022 4:05 PM
Click to return on the top page