Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Nonlicensed Persons - Provisional Licensure
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the owner of a nursing home or other appropriate nursing home authority, under specified circumstances, to immediately appoint a nonlicensed person to serve in the capacity of interim nursing home administrator; authorizing the appointed nonlicensed person to act as the interim nursing home administrator on filing an application with the State Board of Nursing Home Administrators requesting a provisional license; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Nonlicensed Persons - Provisional Licensure
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing canceled
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Nonlicensed Persons - Provisional Licensure
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Referred Rules 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Text - Chapter - Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Nonlicensed Persons - Provisional Licensure
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page