Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Stop Work Orders
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to issue a stop work order for each work site where the Commissioner has made an initial determination that a contractor or subcontractor may have violated the prevailing wage requirements; authorizing a prime contractor to terminate the contract of a subcontractor without incurring certain liability if the subcontractor has a stop work order issued against them; authorizing the Commission to impose a penalty of up to $5,000 for each day a stop work order is violated; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0001
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/06/2021
Legislative Date
10/06/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Stop Work Orders
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/06/2021 10/06/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Stop Work Orders
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 2:09 PM
Click to return on the top page