Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Farms and Families Fund, Maryland Food and Agricultural Resiliency Mechanism Grant Program, and Maryland Farm–to–School Meal Grant Pilot Program – Alterations and Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the purpose and use of the Maryland Farms and Families Fund; establishing the Maryland Food and Agricultural Resiliency Mechanism Grant Program and Fund to award grants to food banks and charitable emergency food providers to alleviate food insecurity; and establishing the Maryland Farm-to-School Meal Grant Pilot Program and Fund to award grants to eligible school districts that include a local food component in school meals and to incentivize the production, procurement, and provision of local foods in school meals.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0121
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Farms and Families Fund, Maryland Food and Agricultural Resiliency Mechanism Grant Program, and Maryland Farm–to–School Meal Grant Pilot Program – Alterations and Establishment
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
(   9.11-101 through 9.11-103 )
Last Updated: 1/21/2022 4:57 PM
Click to return on the top page