Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Governments – Urban Agricultural Incentive Zones – Authorization
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a local government to establish procedures for a qualifying farmer or partner organization to apply to designate an area as an urban agricultural incentive zone; authorizing a local government to designate an urban agricultural incentive zone; establishing an urban agricultural incentive zone advisory committee to advise a local government on the designation of an area as an urban agricultural incentive zone; requiring the Comptroller to distribute 100% of the farm product sales to the local government; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/24/2021
Legislative Date
10/24/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/24/2021 10/24/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Local Governments – Urban Agricultural Incentive Zones – Authorization
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
(   1-1601 through 1-1604 )
Last Updated: 1/18/2022 11:17 AM
Click to return on the top page