Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland New Start Act of 2022
Sponsored by
Delegate J. Lewis
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland New Start Pilot Program in the Department of Commerce to provide multiyear grants to organizations to create or support existing entrepreneurship development programs to provide assistance to certain formerly imprisoned individuals and to provide loans, not to exceed $50,000, to certain individuals participating in those programs; requiring the Department to report to the Governor and General Assembly by January 1, 2029 on funding, services provided, oversight, and overall performance and impact of the Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/07/2021
Legislative Date
10/07/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland New Start Act of 2022
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/07/2021 10/07/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland New Start Act of 2022
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
(   5-1901 through 5-1907 )
Last Updated: 1/12/2022 3:28 PM
Click to return on the top page