Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Boyce
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the application of provisions of law that prohibit an individual from simultaneously being a candidate for more than one public office or office of a political party; prohibiting individuals from simultaneously being a candidate for, or holding, a party office and an elected public office; and providing certain exceptions.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0335 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/31/2021
Legislative Date
10/31/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2022
Legislative Date
1/04/2022
Action
Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/31/2021 10/31/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibition
House 1/04/2022 1/04/2022 Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/17/2022 4:38 PM
Click to return on the top page