Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting certain applicants for identification cards who present certain documentation from the issuance fee for the identification card; extending the term of certain learner's instructional permits from 180 days to 1 year after the date of issuance; and establishing that certain driver's licenses issued to certain holders by the Motor Vehicle Administration remain in full force and effect during an absence from the State.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0277
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/10/2023
Legislative Date
9/10/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-13)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2024
Legislative Date
2/11/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/10/2023 9/10/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards
House 2/15/2024 2/15/2024 Third Reading Passed (125-13) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2024 2/11/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2024 8:06 AM
Click to return on the top page