Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin and Moon
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a provision in a contract or agreement relating to the use of a recreational facility that purports to limit the recreational facility's liability, or release the recreational facility from or indemnify or hold harmless the recreational facility against liability, for injury caused by or resulting from the negligence or other wrongful acts of the recreational facility or its agents or employees is void and unenforceable under certain circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0452
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0207 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/11/2023
Legislative Date
7/11/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/11/2023 7/11/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2024 2/21/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/21/2024 2/21/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/22/2024 1:24 PM
Click to return on the top page