Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' Court
Sponsored by
Chair, Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the judges of the Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County to sit as the Orphans' Court for Anne Arundel County; repealing a requirement that the qualified voters of Anne Arundel County elect three orphans' court judges; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0172
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/17/2013 1/17/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
House 2/13/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page